WA SB5338 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing nonprofit debt adjusters.
Title
Addressing nonprofit debt adjusters.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Donald Benton [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-29 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-27 | House | BFS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-27 | House | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1572 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-23 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.