WA SB5330 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the temporary assistance for needy families grant to be dispensed as an electronic voucher benefit and limited to purposes benefiting children.
Title
Requiring the temporary assistance for needy families grant to be dispensed as an electronic voucher benefit and limited to purposes benefiting children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5330&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5330.pdf |