WA SB5328 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a community aviation revitalization board.
Title
Creating a community aviation revitalization board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |