WA SB5321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ticket sales over the internet.
Title
Concerning ticket sales over the internet.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] |
Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |