WA SB5321 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending a local sales and use tax that is credited against the state sales and use tax.
Title
Extending a local sales and use tax that is credited against the state sales and use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-19 | Chapter 550, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-19 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Passed final passage; yeas, 37; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-25 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-23 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-23 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended. | |
2009-04-23 | House receded from amendments. | |
2009-04-21 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-16 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-27 | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-27 | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Finance. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-03-02 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-26 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-20 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |