WA SB5314 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding public disclosure of information relating to provision of child care and early learning services.
Title
Regarding public disclosure of information relating to provision of child care and early learning services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-02-15 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-15 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-15 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-14 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-07 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1293 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.