WA SB5310 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Effective date 10/9/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing enforcement actions at facilities sited by the energy facility site evaluation council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing enforcement actions at facilities sited by the energy facility site evaluation council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-30 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-14SenateEffective date 10/9/2015.
2015-07-14SenateChapter 39, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session.
2015-07-14SenateGovernor signed.
2015-07-08SenateDelivered to Governor.
2015-07-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2015-06-30HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2015-06-30HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-06-30HouseRead first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar.
2015-06-30SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2015-06-30SenatePlaced on third reading.
2015-06-28SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-27SenateReferred to Rules.
2015-06-23SenatePlaced on third reading.
2015-05-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-24HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2015-04-15HouseReturned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-04-13HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2015-03-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2015-03-24HouseTED - Majority; do pass.
2015-03-24HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2015-03-17HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2015-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development
2015-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2015-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2015-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2015-02-13SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-02-13SenateEET - Majority; do pass.
2015-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
2015-02-11SenateExecutive session in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
2015-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
2015-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback