WA SB5304 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing reentry services to persons releasing from state and local institutions.
Title
Providing reentry services to persons releasing from state and local institutions.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 243, 2021 Laws PV. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-25 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Subjects
CORRECTIONAL FACILITIES AND JAILS
CRIMINAL OFFENDERS
HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY
JUVENILES AND JUVENILE COURT
MENTAL HEALTH
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
PUBLIC POLICY, INSTITUTE FOR
SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER
CRIMINAL OFFENDERS
HEALTH CARE AUTHORITY
JUVENILES AND JUVENILE COURT
MENTAL HEALTH
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
PUBLIC POLICY, INSTITUTE FOR
SUBSTANCE USE DISORDER
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
71 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
71 | 24 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | 470 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | 480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 09 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 09 | 370 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 09 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 09 | 670 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 94 | 049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |