WA SB5299 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning law enforcement officer protection.
Title
Concerning law enforcement officer protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-01-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 118 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
4 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 94a | 831 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 36 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |