WA SB5288 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Effective date 8/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain public transportation benefit areas to impose a sales and use tax increase approved by voters.
Title
Authorizing certain public transportation benefit areas to impose a sales and use tax increase approved by voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2018. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Chapter 53, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2018-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1410 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-02 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.