WA SB5275 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing employers to pay a training wage for a specified period of time.
Title
Allowing employers to pay a training wage for a specified period of time.
Sponsors
Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. John Smith [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1150 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5275&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5275.pdf |