WA SB5272 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding wildlife interactions.
Title
Regarding wildlife interactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-17 | NROR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources and Ocean & Recreation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources, Ocean & Recreation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1626 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.