WA SB5266 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of products sold to adults age 21 and over.
Title
Concerning the regulation of products sold to adults age 21 and over.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: without recommendation (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:30 AM. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1345 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Subjects
HEALTH DEPARTMENTS, LOCAL
HEALTH, DEPARTMENT
INDIANS
LIQUOR AND CANNABIS BOARD
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
TAX PREFERENCES - EXEMPTIONS, CREDITS, DEDUCTIONS, DEFERRALS, ETC.
TAXES - TOBACCO AND TOBACCO PRODUCTS
TAXES - VAPOR PRODUCTS
TOBACCO AND TOBACCO PRODUCTS
VAPOR PRODUCTS
HEALTH, DEPARTMENT
INDIANS
LIQUOR AND CANNABIS BOARD
PUBLIC FUNDS AND ACCOUNTS
TAX PREFERENCES - EXEMPTIONS, CREDITS, DEDUCTIONS, DEFERRALS, ETC.
TAXES - TOBACCO AND TOBACCO PRODUCTS
TAXES - VAPOR PRODUCTS
TOBACCO AND TOBACCO PRODUCTS
VAPOR PRODUCTS
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70 | 155 | 120 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 345 | 010 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 345 | 210 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 25 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 045 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 085 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 25 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |