WA SB5266 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding housing services and assistance in dependency and termination matters.
Title
Regarding housing services and assistance in dependency and termination matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Brandland [R] | Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Debbie Regala [D] |
Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-06 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |