WA SB5262 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing law enforcement access to driver's license photographs for the purposes of identity verification.
Title
Allowing law enforcement access to driver's license photographs for the purposes of identity verification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-06 | Chapter 366, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-06 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | President signed. | |
2009-04-19 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-19 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | APPG - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-04-03 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-03 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-03-24 | PSEP - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-24 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 3. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-18 | JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-13 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1224 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.