WA SB5253 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing the recommendations of the pollinator health task force.
Title
Implementing the recommendations of the pollinator health task force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Chapter 278, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-04-01 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-01 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-24 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Subjects
AGRICULTURE
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
CONSERVATION
CONSERVATION COMMISSION
FARMS AND FARMING
FISH AND WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT
PUBLIC WORKS
TAXES - PROPERTY
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT
COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
CONSERVATION
CONSERVATION COMMISSION
FARMS AND FARMING
FISH AND WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT
PUBLIC WORKS
TAXES - PROPERTY
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 24 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 23 | 300 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 12 | 058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 34 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
89 | 08 | 620 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |