WA SB5229 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 5/7/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-07 - Effective date 5/7/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the legislative youth advisory council.
Title
Regarding the legislative youth advisory council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-07 | Effective date 5/7/2009. | |
2009-05-07 | Chapter 410, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-07 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | President signed. | |
2009-04-19 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-19 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-01 | APPE - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-04-01 | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Education Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-27 | Referred to Education Appropriations. | |
2009-03-26 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-13 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-13 | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-09 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1783 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.