WA SB5228 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing disproportionate health outcomes by building a foundation of equity in medical training.
Title
Addressing disproportionate health outcomes by building a foundation of equity in medical training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee on College & Workforce Development: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 96, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-28 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-17 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |