WA SB5226 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the suspension of licenses for traffic infractions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the suspension of licenses for traffic infractions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-15SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-15SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-15SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-15SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
268040Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4620New CodeSee Bill Text
4620285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4620289Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4620291Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4620342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4620391Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4663New CodeSee Bill Text
4663060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4663070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4663110Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
4664025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4668New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5226&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5226.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5226-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5226%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5226%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5226%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123458&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28622&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback