WA SB5205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the excise taxation of martial arts.
Title
Concerning the excise taxation of martial arts.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-12 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |