WA SB5199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Granting certain correctional employees binding interest arbitration.
Title
Granting certain correctional employees binding interest arbitration.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 280, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-05 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-04-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |