WA SB5199 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 1/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 1/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing tax relief for newspaper publishers.
Title
Providing tax relief for newspaper publishers.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2024. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Chapter 286, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-04-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-14 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2023-04-14 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-04-04 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2023-03-31 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1206 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 102 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 04 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 460 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |