WA SB5198 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain leasehold interests in arenas with a seating capacity of more than two thousand from the leasehold excise tax.
Title
Exempting certain leasehold interests in arenas with a seating capacity of more than two thousand from the leasehold excise tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1301 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Effective date 1/1/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5198&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5198.pdf |