WA SB5191 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating unfair business practices and prohibiting predatory price increases during states of emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating unfair business practices and prohibiting predatory price increases during states of emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-12SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-11SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-11SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM.
2021-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5191&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5191.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5191-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5191-S%20AMS%20PADD%20S1428.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5191-S%20AMS%20PADD%20S1431.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5191-S%20AMS%20PEDE%20S1867.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5191%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5191%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5191%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123399&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28542&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback