WA SB5184 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding compliance reports for second-class school districts.
Title
Regarding compliance reports for second-class school districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-13 | Chapter 45, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-13 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-06 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-05 | President signed. | |
2011-04-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2011-04-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | ED - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-24 | ED - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-02 | First reading, referred to Education. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-03 | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-17 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |