WA SB5177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - First reading, referred to Public Safety.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminating proof of nonmarriage as an element of a sex offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating proof of nonmarriage as an element of a sex offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2021-02-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2021-01-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-28SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 9:30 AM.
2021-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9a44050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44079Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44083Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44086Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44093Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44096Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9a44100Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5177&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5177.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5177%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5177%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5177%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5177%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123373&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28351&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123373&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-16-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5177&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback