WA SB5176 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing criminal incompetency and civil commitment.
Title
Addressing criminal incompetency and civil commitment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-17 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-08 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2013-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2013-03-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-27 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-27 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 5:30 PM. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1114 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-20 - Effective date 7/28/2013.