WA SB5165 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing a transfer of development rights program.
Title
Implementing a transfer of development rights program.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Fred Jarrett [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
Sen. Christopher Marr [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-10 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-10 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-10 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1172 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-14 - Effective date 7/26/2009.