WA SB5163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning actions for wrongful injury or death.
Title
Concerning actions for wrongful injury or death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 159, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Law & Justice. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1135 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.