WA SB5159 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning payments in lieu of real property taxes by the department of the fish and wildlife.
Title
Concerning payments in lieu of real property taxes by the department of the fish and wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 184, 2021 Laws PV. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-24 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |