WA SB5133 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of confidential employee for the purposes of state collective bargaining.
Title
Concerning the definition of confidential employee for the purposes of state collective bargaining.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 180, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 34; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 9:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |