WA SB5128 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the electric motorcycle registration renewal fee.
Title
Reducing the electric motorcycle registration renewal fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |