WA SB5127 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning courthouse facility dogs.
Title
Concerning courthouse facility dogs.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-19 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |