WA SB5122 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the jurisdiction of juvenile court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the jurisdiction of juvenile court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-01SenateOn motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-29SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-01-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-29SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-26SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-22SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
2021-01-08SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1304New CodeSee Bill Text
1304011Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
1304030Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1340020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
13400357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1340080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1340193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1340300Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1340511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1340590Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1340600Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43216New CodeSee Bill Text
9a04050Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5122&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5122.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5122-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5122-S%20AMS%20DARN%20S1625.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5122%20SBA%20HSRR%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5122%20SBR%20HSRR%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5122%20SBR%20HSRR%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123251&actionText=HSRR%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28400&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback