WA SB5119 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a sentence enhancement for body armor.
Title
Creating a sentence enhancement for body armor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-03-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-03-21 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-21 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice . |
Same As/Similar To
HB1907 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.