WA SB5119 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Canceling the 2012 presidential primary.
Title
Canceling the 2012 presidential primary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-12 | Chapter 319, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-12 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-20 | President signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on second reading. | |
2011-04-15 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-04-15 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-04-15 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-04-15 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-04-13 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-04-08 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-03-23 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-25 | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-01-24 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-01-24 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-01-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-14 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1324 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.