WA SB5106 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning municipal access to local financial services.
Title
Concerning municipal access to local financial services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 91, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-05 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2021-04-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-15 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | BFST - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |