WA SB5089 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making changes to factory assembled structures, manufactured or mobile homes, commercial coaches, conversion vending units, medical units, recreational vehicles, and park trailers requirements, including adding board members to the factory assembled structures advisory committee.
Title
Making changes to factory assembled structures, manufactured or mobile homes, commercial coaches, conversion vending units, medical units, recreational vehicles, and park trailers requirements, including adding board members to the factory assembled structures advisory committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 36, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-03-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-03-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-17 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 22 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22a | 005 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22a | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22a | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22a | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22a | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 22a | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |