WA SB5089 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning peace officer hiring and certification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning peace officer hiring and certification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2021-01-06SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4112070Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4112100Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4114100Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4114130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4343020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4343360Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5089&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5089.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5089-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20KUDE%20S1305.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20DOZI%20S1408.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20FORT%20S1405.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20GILD%20S1435.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20HOLY%20S1407.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20HOLY%20S1409.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20HONE%20S1404.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20SHOR%20S1403.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20SHOR%20S1406.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20WAGO%20S1287.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20WAGO%20S1434.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5089-S%20AMS%20KUDE%20S1305.3.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5089%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5089%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5089%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123196&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28351&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback