WA SB5067 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the department of labor and industries certified and registered mail requirements.
Title
Changing the department of labor and industries certified and registered mail requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-05-10 | Chapter 301, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-10 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-19 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-04-18 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-04-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-07 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-04-06 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-16 | LWD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-16 | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-09 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading consent calendar. | |
2011-01-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-25 | LCCP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-01-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1056 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.