WA SB5062 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the management, oversight, and use of data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the management, oversight, and use of data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2021-03-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-03Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-23SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-17SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-15SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-15SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-15SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-15SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-02-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-01-21SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-01-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-21SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2021-01-05SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19New CodeSee Bill Text
4256New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5062&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5062.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5062-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5062-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5062%20SBA%20ENET%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5062%20SBR%20ENET%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5062%20SBR%20ENET%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5062%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5062%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5062%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5062-S2%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123153&actionText=ENET%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28245&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123153&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28627&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123153&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5062&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback