WA SB5042 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning the protection of vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Sen. Cheryl Pflug [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-27 | Chapter 170, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-27 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-15 | President signed. | |
2011-04-14 | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2011-04-14 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-04 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-17 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-03-17 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-08 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-08 | HEA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-07 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1104 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.