WA SB5036 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning conditional commutation by the clemency and pardons board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning conditional commutation by the clemency and pardons board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-01SenateFloor amendment
2021-03-01Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-19SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-04SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-04SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-04SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.
2020-12-24SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
994aNew CodeSee Bill Text
994a501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a633Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a728Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a880Amended CodeSee Bill Text
994a885Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5036&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5036.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5036-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5036-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5036-S2.E.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20BROW%20S1730.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20PADD%20S1700.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20PADD%20S1716.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20RIVE%20S1714.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20SHOR%20S1721.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20WAGO%20S1699.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20WAGO%20S1723.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20WAGO%20S1728.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20WARN%20S1776.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20WILS%20S1717.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5036-S2%20AMS%20WILS%20S1718.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5036%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5036%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5036%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5036%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5036%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5036%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5036-S2.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123097&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28451&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123097&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28629&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123097&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-01-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5036&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback