WA SB5035 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning patients' access to investigational medical products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning patients' access to investigational medical products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-05-05SenateChapter 212, 2017 Laws.
2017-05-05SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-21SenateDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-19SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-17SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-04-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2017-04-06HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-04-06HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-06HouseFloor amendment
2017-04-06HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-29HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-29HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2017-03-24HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2017-03-22HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-02HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness
2017-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-28Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-02SenateHLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Health Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback