WA SB5033 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales and use tax exemptions for prescribed durable medical equipment used in the home and prescribed mobility enhancing equipment.
Title
Concerning sales and use tax exemptions for prescribed durable medical equipment used in the home and prescribed mobility enhancing equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-12-09 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5033&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5033.pdf |