WA SB5032 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Washington code of military justice.
Title
Concerning the Washington code of military justice.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Berkey [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-10 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-03-06 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-06 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-06 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-12-09 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1036 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.