WA SB5025 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 10/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 10/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating sales and use and excise tax exemptions for self-help housing development.
Title
Creating sales and use and excise tax exemptions for self-help housing development.
Sponsors
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage without House Amendments (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 10/1/2019. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 385, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-27 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate insists on its position and asks House to recede. |
2019-04-23 | House | House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-02 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |