WA SB5021 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting electricity generated from renewable resources from the requirements of chapter 19.28 RCW.
Title
Exempting electricity generated from renewable resources from the requirements of chapter 19.28 RCW.
Sponsors
Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Sen. Harry Morton [R] |
Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5021&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5021.pdf |