WA SB5012 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a local government option for the funding of essential affordable housing programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a local government option for the funding of essential affordable housing programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-03SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-03SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-03SenateHLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.
2020-12-14SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6728New CodeSee Bill Text
6728181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8214410Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5012&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5012.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5012-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5012%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5012%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5012%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123036&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28503&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback