WA SB5000 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a hydrogen fuel cell electric vehicle pilot sales and use tax exemption program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a hydrogen fuel cell electric vehicle pilot sales and use tax exemption program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-22SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-15SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to Transportation.
2021-01-21SenateAnd refer to Transportation.
2021-01-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-21SenateENET - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2020-12-07SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8208New CodeSee Bill Text
8212New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5000&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5000.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5000-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5000-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBA%20ENET%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBR%20ENET%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBR%20ENET%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBA%20TRAN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBR%20TRAN%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5000%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=122999&actionText=ENET%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28245&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=122999&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28603&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=122999&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28693&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback